START-RITE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an Ofsted GOOD rated Pre-school in our community of Little Stoke, South Gloucestershire, catering for a diverse group of children from a varied background. Start-Rite can take children aged 2 to 5. We are passionate in maintaining our only local Pre-School and welcome you to join us to bring education through play to children in our area. Why not give us a try!
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 25 April 2016
Total income includes £1,500 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 07 October 1993: Standard registration
- 09 December 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 13 January 2011: Standard registration
- 09 November 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 January 2012: Re-registered
- 01 September 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- START RITE PRE SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Working name)
- LITTLE STOKE PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/04/2012 | 25/04/2013 | 25/04/2014 | 25/04/2015 | 25/04/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.04k | £37.96k | £19.46k | £41.12k | £33.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.18k | £39.83k | £28.04k | £32.75k | £32.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 25 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 25 April 2016 | 06 March 2017 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 April 2016 | 09 March 2017 | 12 days late | |
Annual return | 25 April 2015 | 18 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 April 2015 | 18 February 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 25 April 2014 | 23 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 April 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Scheme dated 29 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window