THE TRUST FUND OF THE ROTARY CLUB OF TOOTING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide support and assist with funding for global humanitarian and community projects incl: Polio plus, mercy ships, wheelchair foundation, mosquito nets, group youth exchange, the education and book appeal Ghana, equipment for local and international hospitals, tree planting, special needs schools, awards for school achievers/young person of the year, kids out etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 07 October 1993: Standard registration
- THE ROTARY CLUB OF TOOTING (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Hussain | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Chris Case | Trustee | 30 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.89k | £5.80k | £12.28k | £8.96k | £8.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.64k | £7.53k | £12.19k | £13.51k | £13.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 19 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 19 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 384 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 384 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 750 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 750 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 May 2025 | 1111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 192 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6TH SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR TO AND FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE INSTITUTION SOCIETY OR OBJECT AS THE CLUB DIRECTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE TOOTING
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 Seely Road
LONDON
SW17 9QP
- Phone:
- 02087675450
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window