CHISWICK PIER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To secure the preservation, protection, development and improvement of an access to and from the Thames at and around the London Borough of Hounslow and associated buildings and waterside areas of particular beauty or of historical and architectural interest. To educate the public in the ecology, history and natural history of the Thames
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hounslow
Governance
- 08 October 1993: Standard registration
- CORNEY REACH DEVELOPMENT TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Mary Wright | Chair | 22 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Marlene Johnson | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jasmine Crocker | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glen Cowsill | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Hartill | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Croft | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Richard Graeme Bryson | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Graham Winchester | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
James David Herbert McConnell | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Gabriella Sabrina Gonzalez Giles | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Roberts | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
simon clarke | Trustee | 14 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JACLYN HORTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £134.02k | £137.31k | £162.72k | £189.28k | £213.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £137.60k | £139.02k | £131.68k | £155.57k | £173.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/09/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/11/2015
Charitable objects
(A)TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF AN ACCESS TO AND FROM THE THAMES AT AND AROUND THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HOUNSLOW AND ASSOCIATED BUILDINGS AND WATERSIDE AREAS OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR OF HISTORICAL OR ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST (B)TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ECOLOGY, HISTORY AND NATURAL HISTORY OF THE THAMES (C)TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE TO THE BENEFICIAL AREA (D)TO UNDERTAKE OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THOSE LIVING OR WORKING IN THE AREA BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HOUNSLOW AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHISWICK PIER TRUST
THE PIER HOUSE
CORNEY REACH WAY
LONDON
W4 2UG
- Phone:
- 02087422713
- Email:
- trust@chiswickpier.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window