Accounts and annual returns PORT OF TILBURY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1026959
Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 December 2024 327 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 December 2024 692 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 November 2022 275 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 February 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required