Financial history THE SURREY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES

Charity number: 1026988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £176.25k £148.95k £171.33k £166.00k £161.90k
Total expenditure £236.94k £134.66k £177.31k £187.66k £174.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A