Governance THE SURREY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Charity number: 1026988

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 08 October 1993: Standard registration
- 08 July 2014: Funds received from 291570 GODSTONE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE (SURREY)
- 01 February 2017: Funds received from 1025177 BLETCHINGLEY (AFTERNOON) WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
- 20 October 2022: Funds received from 285928 MERSTHAM WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
- 29 August 2023: Funds received from 1028576 HEATHERSIDE WOMENS INSTITUTE
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
No other names
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.