Trustees THE SURREY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Charity number: 1026988

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgina Wagner | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dorinda Brittle | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Grove | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jill Ann Arthur | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Elizabeth Robertson | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janice Jenner | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Thomas | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jill Mulryan | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angie Leach | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.