Trustees FRIENDS OF OLD BASING SCHOOLS
Charity number: 1027057

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgina Emma Bole | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Antrobus | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Clare O'Beirne | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Grayson | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Denise Connor | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Janine White | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Leisl Porter | Trustee | 03 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Adams | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sue SAunders | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kate Watson | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Claire Richards | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Emily May | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Emma Sylvester-Bradley | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Wittstock | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.