1ST BRILL SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1027072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our aim is to promote the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials, as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local, national and international communities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £22,400
Total expenditure: £22,065

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 October 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN PETER RAWDON JOHNSON Chair
CHILTERN VALE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Speen Scout Hut
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ASHENDON
Received: On time
Gemma Caroline Booth Trustee 13 September 2022
None on record
Graeme James Hope Trustee 14 September 2021
None on record
Jennifer Collins Trustee 07 September 2021
None on record
Rebecca Wasey Trustee 07 September 2021
None on record
Mark Hill Trustee 08 September 2020
None on record
NICOLA JANE LOGAN Trustee 22 November 2012
None on record
Elizabeth Janice JOHNSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.39k £22.74k £25.51k £14.80k £22.40k
Total expenditure £18.41k £13.67k £12.36k £25.93k £22.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.10k £10.67k £50 £500

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Firs
Brill
Aylesbury
HP18 9RY
Phone:
01296655137