Accounts and annual returns BELMONT VILLAGE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1027080
Charity reporting is overdue by 1562 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 March 2023 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 February 2022 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1197 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 April 2021 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1562 days