FRIENDS OF SLIP END LOWER SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christmas and Summer Fayres held to raise monies to subsidize school trips for the children, for purchase items for the classroom and pay for the sportscoach at the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 13 October 1993: Standard registration
- SLIP END LOWER SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- SLIP LOWER SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Godfrey | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jaroslava Handley | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Lenton | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Clark | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Acton | Trustee | 24 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.29k | £5.92k | £16.16k | £13.60k | £8.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.43k | £6.52k | £5.77k | £19.44k | £19.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.98k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 10 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 16 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 SEPTEMBER 1993, AS AMENDED IN 13 DECEMBER 2002 (NAME CHANGE)
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
SLIP END VILLAGE SCHOOL
ROSS WAY
SLIP END
LUTON
LU1 4DD
- Phone:
- 01582457502
- Email:
- fosels@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window