Accounts and annual returns LITTLE SNORING PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1027145
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2020 08 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 08 March 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2019 16 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 16 December 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2018 23 July 2019 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 23 July 2019 114 days late