LITTLE SNORING PLAYGROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Childcare provision and education for all children between the ages of 2 and a half and 5 years (during school term). Toddler and parent/carer group (weekly during school term).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 20 October 1993: Standard registration
- 16 September 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 16 September 2021: Funds transferred to 1192130 LITTLE SNORING PRE-SCHOOL
- LITTLE SNORING PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2016 | 31/05/2017 | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.02k | £51.45k | £50.07k | £57.26k | £49.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.64k | £41.60k | £49.80k | £43.23k | £52.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 16 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | 16 December 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2018 | 23 July 2019 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2018 | 23 July 2019 | 114 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH MAY 1992
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window