ARGYLE PRE-SCHOOL NURSERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Argyle Pre School is a voluntary committee led charity providing early years education for children aged 2 to 5 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £173,464 from 14 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 28 October 1993: Standard registration
- ARGYLE PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christina Stokes | Chair | 01 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Holly Fitzsimons | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Katie Myatt | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alice Crouchman | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Karis Collett | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £154.64k | £139.57k | £163.61k | £212.58k | £194.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.01k | £149.23k | £151.16k | £161.46k | £186.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £137.06k | £108.23k | £123.54k | £153.19k | £173.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 SEPTEMBER 1991 AND AMENDED 30 JANUARY 1996
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Old School Site
Cornerstone
2 Woodhouse Lane
TAMWORTH
- Phone:
- 0182755405
- Email:
- argylenursery@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window