ILKESTON LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity events throughout Ilkeston and local area. Events include the organisation and running of the Annual Ilkeston Carnival, Chocolate Easter Eggs and Xmas Santas raffled in local pubs, Market Stalls, Raffles at local Banqueting Suite on the run upto Xmas. Help given to local community of all ages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 15 October 1993: Standard registration
- 18 January 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.68k | £9.19k | £7.58k | £4.56k | £7.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.39k | £10.59k | £10.00k | £3.79k | £10.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 08 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 16 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 06 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 12 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 AUGUST 1993
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window