Accounts and annual returns SOUTH FERRIBY PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1027204

Charity reporting is overdue by 304 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 304 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 304 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 November 2022 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 November 2022 | 133 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 October 2021 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 October 2021 | 102 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 October 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window