Financial history PERRAN-AR-WORTHAL PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1027212
Charity reporting is overdue by 1040 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £34.62k £38.92k £64.15k £31.89k £61.23k
Total expenditure £36.62k £32.59k £54.50k £36.73k £66.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £21.60k £41.53k £21.43k £42.88k
Income from government grants £22.56k £1.00k £1.50k £1.45k £1.80k