Accounts and annual returns ALL SAINTS RANGEMORE P T A

Charity number: 1027214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 16 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 16 October 2024 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 October 2024 474 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 October 2024 839 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 July 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required