Financial history ABINGTON PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1027241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £113.08k £101.32k £115.26k £116.83k £61.71k
Total expenditure £115.26k £95.23k £104.92k £119.50k £54.07k
Income from government contracts £64.83k £66.40k £74.71k £66.65k £36.46k
Income from government grants N/A £13.35k N/A N/A N/A