Accounts and annual returns CHESTNUT TREES

Charity number: 1027257
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 14 June 2020 350 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required