HOLY TRINITY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
School events to raise funds for the children's benefit. Eg, Summer fete, Christmas bazaar, Uniform sales. We buy equipment , books etc for the school and run discos, events for the children. During some school years, specific fundraising activities are held e.g fundraising for solar panels to support the school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 19 October 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karl Handy | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.92k | £2.95k | £0 | £9.54k | £9.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.15k | £6.01k | £0 | £6.48k | £11.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 January 2025 | 201 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/10/1990 AS AMENDED ON 26/05/1993 AS AMENDED ON 14/04/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holy Trinity C of E Primary School
Beridge Road
HALSTEAD
CO9 1JH
- Phone:
- 01787472096
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window