Financial history CORRINGHAM CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1027307
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.24k £543 £1.58k £2.95k £2.36k
Total expenditure £2.26k £636 £1.76k £2.68k £2.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A