RAINBOW PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our sessions at Rainbow are mainly free play but with some adult lead activities. During the session the children are free to choose from the many creative and cross-curricular selection of activities on offer. The activities are changed during the session to keep the children stimulated.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 20 October 1993: Standard registration
- RAINBOW PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
- RAINBOW PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- RAINBOW PLAYGROUP (CRAWLEY) (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Vygus | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee-Ann Hyett | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH TIPPETT | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £170.43k | £151.82k | £173.29k | £212.65k | £274.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £189.09k | £149.89k | £170.47k | £228.14k | £287.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 April 2025 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 April 2025 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 March 2025 | 398 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 March 2025 | 398 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 May 2023 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 May 2023 | 100 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 May 2023 | 458 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 May 2023 | 458 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JANUARY 1992 AS AMENDED 6 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rainbow Pre School
Barrington Road
CRAWLEY
RH10 6DG
- Phone:
- 01293427180
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window