Accounts and annual returns MILWICH PRE-SCHOOL & LOLLIPOPS BEFORE & AFTER SCHOOL CLUB

Charity number: 1027313
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2017 27 June 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 27 June 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2016 29 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 29 June 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2015 30 June 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 July 2016 22 days late