HIGH HAM PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enhance the development and education of children under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £98,870 from 1 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 20 October 1993: Standard registration
- HIGH HAM PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Vigar | Chair | 22 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kimberley Sarah Huntley | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Robinson | Trustee | 22 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amy Robertson | Trustee | 22 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Bean | Trustee | 22 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Skeet | Trustee | 22 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Clare Vigar | Trustee | 22 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Eve Peppard | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.72k | £126.62k | £111.02k | £140.88k | £152.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.59k | £117.40k | £113.56k | £144.60k | £136.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £65.68k | £88.10k | N/A | £92.88k | £98.87k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.75k | £55.23k | £3.42k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 06 October 2020 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 06 October 2020 | 128 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 MARCH 1993
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
High Ham PreSchool
High Ham
LANGPORT
Somerset
TA10 9BY
- Phone:
- 01458259739
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window