THE OLIVER JONES MEMORIAL HALL AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity Number: 1027326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

providing facilities for local people that wish to run community activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £18,882
Total expenditure: £5,877

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Denbighshire
  • Shropshire
  • Wrexham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 October 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ralph Bennett Trustee 24 June 2019
None on record
Graham Barrow Trustee 24 June 2019
None on record
Edward Johnston Trustee 24 June 2019
None on record
Chris Futcher Trustee 24 June 2019
None on record
Rev Phillip Carey Trustee 24 June 2019
None on record
Davena Davies Trustee 24 June 2019
None on record
Pamela Hughes Trustee 15 October 2018
None on record
Edith Jones Trustee 15 October 2018
None on record
Eifion Lloyd Davies Trustee 10 September 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.74k £24.73k £4.61k £3.93k £18.88k
Total expenditure £7.53k £2.88k £4.39k £6.80k £5.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £23.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 November 2024 282 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Oliver Jones Memorial Hall
Llwynmawr
Llangollen
LL20 7BB
Phone:
01691718912
Website:

No information available