TASTE FOR ADVENTURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of outdoor activities to young and elderly disadvantaged or less able people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 19 October 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LES DAVIES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Tom Donaldson | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Heather Hall | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
AMY-LOUISE WARREN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KRISTY GILLISPIE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £183.82k | £159.41k | £148.84k | £169.90k | £205.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £236.48k | £217.26k | £222.88k | £238.29k | £261.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £54.29k | £38.31k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 DECEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 22 SEPTEMBER 1993 AND 22 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, TO INCLUDE THE SERVICE AND EX-SERVICE COMMUNITY, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY TO SUPPLY QUALIFIED INSTRUCTORS, GUIDES AND TEACHERS AND PURCHASE, LEASE OR RENT SUITABLE ACCOMMODATION FOR SHELTER, COOKING, STORAGE AND TEACHING AND TO PROVIDE ALL TRANSPORT, SPECIALIST CLOTHING AND EQUIPMENT FOR ROCK CLIMBING, CANOEING, ABSEILING, CAVING, PONY TREKKING, HIKING AND ALL OUTDOOR ACTIVITIES AND SPORTS AND TO WORK IN ASSOCIATION WITH EDUCATIONAL SERVICES, YOUTH TRAINING SERVICES, SERVICE AND EX-SERVICE COMMUNITY, POLICE AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 1A
Holmer Trading Estate
College Road
Hereford
HR1 1JS
- Phone:
- 01432359392
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window