GRANGE PLAYGROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Pre-School Playgroup for 2-5 year olds. We operate within the Grange Children?s Centre. We open 38 weeks of the year. We offer up to 5 daily sessions per child. We run sessions 5 mornings and 5 afternoons. We offer an indoor and outdoor learning experience and opportunities for parents/carers/children to come and engage with each other.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Ealing
Governance
- 27 October 1993: Standard registration
- 09 August 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 April 2012: Re-registered
- 30 July 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- GRANGE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.81k | £123.82k | £140.11k | £92.73k | £111.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.23k | £134.89k | £125.74k | £150.17k | £129.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 February 2023 | 242 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 February 2023 | 242 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 01 June 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window