BACUP FELLOWSHIP OF CHURCHES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Money is raised through the charity shops to make grants, as decided by the trustees, to local groups serving the Bacup community. Clothing, bedding and toys, as and when available in the shops are given to those who for any reason find themselves in desperate need, usually by referral. As a group of churches we work together to promote the Christian faith through ecumenical events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 19 October 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Bartram | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Derek Allen | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Rev DAVID JOHN BURROW | Trustee | 27 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Veda Hitchen | Trustee | 24 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY ALCOCK | Trustee | 27 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN ELIZABETH WHITELEGG | Trustee | 04 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
KAREN ROSEMARY SPENCER | Trustee | 04 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.89k | £72.47k | £67.16k | £89.11k | £107.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.07k | £68.04k | £61.50k | £75.81k | £98.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £26.13k | £13.40k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 17 December 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MAY 1993
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION (2) TO RELIEVE NEED HARDSHIP SICKNESS AND DISTRESS (3) TO PROVIDE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABILITY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
BACUP, LANCASHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
73 BANKSIDE LANE
BACUP
OL13 8HP
- Phone:
- 01706876584
- Email:
- fielding73@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window