Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF DUNSTABLE DOWNS TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1027349
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £8.63k £308.92k £14.33k £20.24k £25.95k
Total expenditure £8.81k £10.20k £15.65k £12.57k £23.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A