SUTTON ON THE FOREST PRESCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-school education for children from 2 years to school age
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £48,485 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 21 October 1993: Standard registration
- 29 July 2020: Funds received from 1042949 EASINGWOLD PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
- SUTTON ON THE FOREST PLAYGROUP AND TODDLERS (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELAINE GRAINGER | Chair | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Wilson | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Bowling | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Dawson | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Clark | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.30k | £49.76k | £73.11k | £70.38k | £81.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.80k | £45.89k | £53.61k | £58.33k | £67.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £39.51k | £37.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £50.32k | £40.09k | £48.49k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/04/1993 AS AMENDED ON 04/04/2014
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHERRY TREE HOUSE
HUBY ROAD
SUTTON-ON-THE-FOREST
YORK
YO61 1DT
- Phone:
- 01347810596
- Email:
- SUTTONPRESCHOOL@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window