PURBECK RADAR MUSEUM TRUST

Charity Number: 1027390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Education of the general public in the evolution of British Radar its operational use in WW2 and subsequent developments

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £423
Total expenditure: £360

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 October 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR PHILLIP EDWARD JUDKINS Chair
COMMUNICATIONS AND ELECTRONICS MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
WAKEFIELD HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
MIKE DEAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £20 £30 £42 £102 £423
Total expenditure £75 £126 £10 £235 £360
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 January 2021 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
18 ST. JOHNS SQUARE
WAKEFIELD
WF1 2RA
Phone:
07971449451