LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF REGENCY HIGH SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the League of Friends(PTA), is to advance the education of the pupils in the school. Our objectives may a) develop more extended relationships between staff, parents and others associated with the school; b) engage in activities which support the school and advance the education of the pupils attending it; c) assist in the provision of such facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 25 October 1993: Standard registration
- LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF ROSEHILL SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julien Henri Alexandre Cantin | Chair | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Heather Catherine Walker | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Taylor | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Broadbent | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.95k | £6.37k | £6.49k | £7.58k | £3.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.41k | £783 | £1.79k | £23.09k | £2.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 September 2024 | 216 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 MARCH 1993 AS AMENDED ON 24 APRIL 2007.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
REGENCY HIGH SCHOOL
CARNFORTH DRIVE
WORCESTER
WR4 9JL
- Phone:
- 01905454828
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window