ISLAMIC INFORMATION CENTRE - HASTINGS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The basic aim is to remove the misgivings about Islam. It is done by an opportunistic personal discussion and lecture or debate by invitation. A free distribution of Qur'an, Islamic or related Books, CDs and DVDs to non Muslims. A stall is set up for the access to public and free distribution of Islamic literature on Interfaith or similar festivals and Open Days of the Hastings Mosque.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
Governance
- 19 October 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yusuf Rajbee Dr | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Afaaf Sameera Rajbee | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Faisal Tariq Rajbee | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
DR TARIQ YUSUF RAJBEE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr AFTAB AHMAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ATIYA TARIQ RAJBEE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 08/07/2020 | 08/07/2021 | 08/07/2022 | 08/07/2023 | 08/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60 | £120 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £21 | £50 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 July 2024 | 13 May 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 July 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 July 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 July 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 July 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29TH SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE ISLAMIC RELIGION TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC, INCLUDING MUSLIMS AND NON-MUSLIMS OF THE BASIC TENETS OF ISLAM, BASED ON THE HOLY QU'RAN AND THE SUNNAH (SAYINGS AND PRACTICES OF PROPHET MOHAMMED, PEACE BE UPON HIM) 2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY MEANS OF PROVIDING INFORMATION AND ESTABLISHING AN ARABIC LANGUAGE SCHOOL, COMMUNITY CENTRE AND A LIBRARY TO INFORM, ACQUAINT AND EDUCATE THE GENERAL PUBLIC OF THE ARABIC CULTURE, LANGUAGE AND TEACHING OF ISLAM
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, HASTINGS AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CEDARS
PETT ROAD
PETT
HASTINGS
TN35 4HB
- Phone:
- 01424812727
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window