AYLESBURY MUSIC CENTRE PARENTS AND TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds to support musical activities at Aylesbury Music Centre. AMC provides musical education for schoolchildren in Buckinghamshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 20 October 1993: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF AYLESBURY MUSIC CENTRE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathryn Fiona Aldersea | Chair | 19 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Karl Grexhammer | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hood | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Louis Stubbs | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Suna Erdem | Trustee | 19 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Purchase | Trustee | 21 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Johanna Powell | Trustee | 08 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sam Bosompem | Trustee | 08 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Penny Hale | Trustee | 08 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Fay Hayhurst | Trustee | 08 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Tom Horn | Trustee | 10 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.64k | £2.52k | £1.51k | £2.13k | £543 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.28k | £2.26k | £17.12k | £1.77k | £1.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 678 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 678 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1043 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1043 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 July 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 July 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 18 SEPTEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 5 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE CENTRE
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE CENTRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Aylesbury Music Centre
Walton Road
Aylesbury
HP21 7ST
- Phone:
- 01494 216 066
- Email:
- famc.chair@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window