Financial history MARINERS OF BEWL

Charity Number: 1027432
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £8.05k £6.77k £8.29k £4.32k £6.84k
Total expenditure £14.01k £10.94k £2.16k £4.49k £3.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A