Governing document MARINERS OF BEWL

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND FEBRUARY 1992 AS AMENDED 18TH SEPTEMBER 1993, 18TH FEBRUARY 1995 AND 25TH FEBRUARY 2002, AS AMENDED 28 FEBRUARY 2004 AND 06 FEBRUARY 2010 AS AMENDED ON 29 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 04 MAR 2017 as amended on 23 Mar 2019 as amended on 20 Mar 2021 as amended on 27 Feb 2025 as amended on 27 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF MOB IS THE RELIEF OF PHYSICALLY DISABLED PERSONS RESIDING IN THE SOUTH EAST BY BRINGING SUCH PERSONS INTO CLOSER ASSOCIATION WITH ABLE BODIED PEOPLE AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF WATER BASED ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE SOUTH EAST ENGLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.