Accounts and annual returns TWINKLE TOTS PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1027459
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 14 February 2025 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 14 February 2025 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 19 February 2024 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 19 February 2024 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 12 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 12 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 07 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 07 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 19 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window