TWINKLE TOTS PRE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Twinkle Tots has been in existence for over 30 years and has provided quality childcare for many children, from all religious, social, ethic and social groups. Children can start Pre School at the age of 2 years up to school age. We are open between 9.00am to 3.00pm, Monday to Friday, 38 weeks per year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £167,913 from 10 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 20 October 1993: Standard registration
- TWINKLE TOTS PLAYGROUP (Working name)
- TWINKLETOTS PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maria Galeanu | Chair | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Qian Richards | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Galeanu | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Katsamentidi | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susana Xavier | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Ndagire | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.39k | £150.94k | £130.00k | £128.64k | £178.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.93k | £129.66k | £130.95k | £128.65k | £170.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £135.45k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.50k | £4.63k | £117.54k | £9.44k | £167.91k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 14 February 2025 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 14 February 2025 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 APR 1993 AS AMENDED ON 14 JUL 2010 AS AMENDED ON 01 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heelands Meeting Place
Glovers Lane
Heelands
Milton Keynes
MK13 7LW
- Phone:
- 01908 311911
- Email:
- twinkletotsoffice@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window