Trustees TWINKLE TOTS PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1027459
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Maria Galeanu Chair 06 June 2024
None on record
Qian Richards Trustee 10 June 2024
None on record
Daniel Galeanu Trustee 06 June 2024
None on record
Maria Katsamentidi Trustee 03 June 2024
None on record
Susana Xavier Trustee 05 July 2023
None on record
Mary Ndagire Trustee 07 February 2023
None on record