ORTON WISTOW COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide local users and user groups with room hire facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 27 October 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Piercy | Chair | 26 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Chapman | Trustee | 30 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
SURY DHANECHA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.08k | £4.64k | £18.23k | £27.76k | £19.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.19k | £9.50k | £12.42k | £14.34k | £20.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | £910 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 September 2024 | 217 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 MAY 1993 as amended on 30 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS OF ORTON WISTOW AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX SEXUAL ORIENTATION RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANVCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURETIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERTION WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY ) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
ORTON WISTOW PETERBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Orton Wistow Community Centre
55 Napier Place
Orton Wistow
Peterborough
PE2 6XN
- Phone:
- 07821 704722
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window