THE ROTARY CLUB OF SANDERSTEAD & SELSDON SERVING SOUTH CROYDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 04 November 1993: Standard registration
- THE ROTARY CLUB OF CROYDON SOUTH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Cooper | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Philip Morgan | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
TImothy David Charles PARR | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
WENDY PARR | Trustee | 27 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.87k | £25.66k | £27.59k | £17.73k | £25.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.81k | £21.79k | £18.28k | £25.14k | £22.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 July 2024 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 August 2023 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 10 August 2023 | 102 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 02 June 2023 | 398 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 02 August 2023 | 459 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 May 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 27 SEPTEMBER 1993. AS AMENDED ON 01 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR TO OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE INSTITUTION, SOCIETY OR OBJECT AS THE CLUB SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
28B PARK ROAD
KENLEY
CR8 5AQ
- Phone:
- 07595180150
- Email:
- wendparr@gmail.com
- Website:
-
rotarysandersteadandselsdon.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window