Financial history THE COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1027525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £80.75k £79.64k £91.52k £99.30k £86.25k
Total expenditure £89.75k £90.72k £95.93k £94.41k £102.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £75.01k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £500 N/A