BBC MARSHALL PLAN OF THE MIND TRUST
Charity Number: 1027536
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 22 October 1993: Standard registration
- 29 April 2002: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- BBC MPM (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 SEPTEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 19 NOVEMBER 1992 AND 27 SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND DEVELOP THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PRESENTATION, PUBLICATION, BROADCASTING AND DISSEMINATION OF EDUCATIONAL MATERIAL WORLD-WIDE
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE THE FORMER SOVIET BLOC
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.