Accounts and annual returns ULCC

Charity Number: 1027560
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 22 June 2024 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 11 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 03 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 10 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 10 November 2020 163 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required