Governing document ULCC
Charity Number: 1027560

Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JANUARY 1993 AS AMENDED 19 JUNE 1993, 5TH JULY 1996 AND 24 AUGUST 2001 as amended on 12 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE IMPROVE DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF LITURGICAL CHORAL MUSIC BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH MUSIC FOR CHRISTIAN CHURCH SERVICES AND BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE ASSOCIATION THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.