Accounts and annual returns HELMSLEY AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 1027566
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 03 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 02 July 2024 187 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 28 December 2023 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 22 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 30 June 2021 183 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required