Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF UPTON HALL SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1027600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 29 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 11 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required