Crowhurst Preschool

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
pre-school activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £48,194 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 26 October 1993: Standard registration
- BEXHILL AND BATTLE UNDER FIVES CROWHURST PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- CROWHURST PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- CROWHURST PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natalie Redman | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Hale | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Cordeux | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gina Ashrafi | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tessa Rose | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Thompson | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Nilson | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Corrigan | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Stewart | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.12k | £39.51k | £42.69k | £57.39k | £78.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.21k | £39.46k | £48.33k | £48.95k | £65.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £31.11k | £26.59k | £40.45k | £48.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 MAY 1993, AND 4TH JUNE 1997. as amended on 01 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crowhurst Youth Hut
Crowhurst
Crowhurst
Battle
East Sussex
- Phone:
- 01424 830676
- Email:
- crowhurstpreschool@gmail.com
- Website:
-
crowhurstpreschool@weebly.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window