PONTESBURY PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of pre-shool education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Shropshire
Governance
- 09 November 1993: Standard registration
- 04 August 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PONTESBURY PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.61k | £48.08k | £45.91k | £43.70k | £32.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.46k | £56.72k | £47.65k | £43.85k | £33.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 22 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | 22 April 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 13 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | 13 June 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 24 October 2013 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | 24 October 2013 | 116 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 02 November 2012 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | 02 November 2012 | 125 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/09/1998 AS AMENDED ON 14/03/2011 AS AMENDED ON 17/10/2011
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window